UNITED KINGDOM RAGDOLL CAT COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dedicated to the welfare of domestic cats. Provide domestic cat rehoming and welfare scheme. Work to support cat owners in all aspects of care and to encourage responsible cat ownership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 November 2005: Standard registration
- THE RAGDOLL CAT TRUST (Working name)
- UK RAGDOLL REHOMING AND WELFARE (Working name)
- UKRCC (Working name)
- United Kingdom Rescue Cat Community (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darren Farrow | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Matthew John Alden-Farrow | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Helen Alden-Farrow | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR DAVE TINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN ALDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20 | £10 | £23 | £86 | £77 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £32 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR RAGDOLL CATS, BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE WELFARE OF RAGDOLL CATS IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG SUCH ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 FARADAY DRIVE
SHENLEY LODGE
MILTON KEYNES
MK5 7DD
- Phone:
- 01908394803
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window