Financial history PAVILION DANCE SOUTH WEST LIMITED

Charity number: 1111641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.33m £1.17m £968.62k £1.01m £999.37k
Total expenditure £1.57m £1.06m £1.09m £1.04m £1.01m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £754.45k £969.37k £840.78k £714.71k £516.31k
Income - Donations and legacies £171.90k £355.79k £188.42k £181.13k £182.86k
Income - Other trading activities £160.56k £54.04k £57.20k £97.50k £80.00k
Income - Charitable activities £994.51k £756.88k £722.94k £729.67k £734.06k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.06k £178 £67 £1 £2.45k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £11.05k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.57m £985.05k £1.00m £923.92k £880.35k
Expenditure - Raising funds £5.73k £79.77k £83.63k £111.62k £124.91k
Expenditure - Governance £16.16k £6.65k £7.02k £147.30k £7.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0