Accounts and annual returns FAREHAM AND GOSPORT MIND LIMITED

Charity number: 1111818
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 03 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 16 December 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 18 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 02 January 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 13 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 20 February 2012 20 days late