THE LIFESPRING FOUNDATION (AFRICA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) To promote the benefit of local communities including but not by way of limitation, single parent families and children adversely affected by poverty and diseases such as HIV/AIDS in Zambia and in such other parts of Africa and the world as the trustees may from time to time think fit;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Zambia
Governance
- 01 December 2005: Standard registration
- THE LIFESPRING FOUNDATION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Clarke | Chair |
|
||||||
Josephine Benn | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geraldine Burn | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY SIMON KUCHANNY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.67k | £4.98k | £3.22k | £2.82k | £1.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.08k | £5.65k | £7.98k | £12.90k | £10 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 1 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF LOCAL COMMUNITIES INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION SINGLE PARENT FAMILIES AND CHILDREN ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY POVERTY AND DISEASES SUCH AS HIV/AIDS IN ZAMBIA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY SCHOOL AND TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS IN ZAMBIA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND C) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN ZAMBIA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF AFRICA AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
ZAMBIA, AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD RECTORY
SINGLETON
CHICHESTER
WEST SUSSEX
PO18 0HF
- Phone:
- 01243811482
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window