THE WIRRAL SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the arts, and in particular orchestral music by the presentation of public concerts and recitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wirral
Governance
- 18 November 2005: Standard registration
- WIRRAL SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA (Working name)
- WSO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT PAUL WYNN | Chair | 26 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
WARREN TEMPLE | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER WILLIAM ROBSON | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA TEMPLE | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN LOUISE MCKEOWN | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Eleanor Archer | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
HILARY JOANNE DUNCOMBE | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROSALEEN MARION GARNER | Trustee | 01 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH DARLINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIENNE CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.77k | £9.49k | £90 | £15.16k | £19.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.21k | £7.03k | £396 | £13.96k | £21.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 February 2022 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 February 2022 | 599 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR ORCHESTRAL MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND BY ANY OTHER SUCH WAYS AS THE SOCIETY SHALL DETERMINE, BEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF WIRRAL AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
WIRRAL AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Elwyn Road
WIRRAL
Merseyside
CH47 7AP
- Phone:
- 07738021998
- Email:
- info@wirralsymphony.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window