THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR DEVELOPMENTAL ORIGINS OF HEALTH AND DISEASE / DOHAD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organised 10th World DOHaD Congress Rotterdam; 530 peer-reviewed papers, 100 awards/fellowships to developing country delegates/ young investigators. We continued a 2-monthly DOHaD journal, obtained PubMed indexing. Our members co-chaired the Commission on Ending Childhood Obesity (ECHO) at the World Health Assembly, produced a joint policy statement for advocacy with NCD Alliance and NCD Child.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Algeria
- Argentina
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- France
- Gabon
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Ireland
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Peru
- Poland
- Portugal
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sudan
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Turkey
- Uganda
- United States
- Uruguay
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 09 November 2006: Standard registration
- 17 January 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1190519 THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR DEVELOPMENTAL ORIGIN...
- THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR DEVELOPMENTAL ORIGINS OF HEALTH AND DESEASE / DOHAD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.03k | £50.03k | £30.79k | £23.74k | £36.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.66k | £15.66k | £37.81k | £16.59k | £35.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND RELIEVE SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BY NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) PROMOTING THE CO-ORDINATION OF A RESEARCH STRATEGY IN DIFFERENT COUNTRIES FOR THE SCIENTIFIC EXPLORATION OF EARLY DEVELOPMENT IN RELATION TO CHRONIC DISEASE IN LATER LIFE. 2) PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH STRATEGIES TO PREVENT CHRONIC DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window