Financial history THE BIANCA JAGGER HUMAN RIGHTS FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1117142
Charity reporting is up to date (106 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £58.70k £2.89k £95.54k £49.22k £17.38k
Total expenditure £165.49k £135.46k £78.19k £34.63k £38.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A