THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGISTS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. The advancement of education and training of the public in matters related to IT 2. Promoting the effectiveness and efficiency of charities and the effective use of resources to achieve charitable purposes by the provision of advice and support in relation to IT 3. Subject to 1 & 2 above the provision of grants for such purposes as are charitable according to the law of England & Wales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 March 2006: Standard registration
- THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGISTS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Hugh Angel | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Nigel Eglin | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Barbara Holland | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Berry | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Serena Aleem Chaudhry Pandey | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Bryan John Parkinson | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Soar | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Pone | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stefan Fafinski DL | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £473.74k | £315.90k | £832.35k | £375.36k | £365.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £716.20k | £391.58k | £483.74k | £472.27k | £392.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £665.79k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £4.61k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £2.20k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £140.26k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £19.49k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £500.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £467.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £16.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £14.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £229.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £16.24k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 02 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 FEBRUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY EXTRAORDINARY GENERAL MEETING 28 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATED TO INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY. 3.2 PROMOTING THE EFFECTIVENESS AND EFFICIENCY OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES TO ACHIEVE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT IN RELATION TO INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY. 3.3 SUBJECT TO OBJECTS 3.1 AND 3.2, THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
39A BARTHOLOMEW CLOSE
LONDON
EC1A 7JN
- Phone:
- 02038710253
- Email:
- info@wcit.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window