Trustees Citizens Advice Darlington, Redcar and Cleveland
Charity number: 1112414

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ross Duerden Webber | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas Tait | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Joan Buckle | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marian Fairley | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael James Betterton | Trustee | 22 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Howard Payne | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Redhead | Trustee | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christine Flintoft-Smith | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Jeffrey Pimm | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIAM MURPHY | Trustee | 17 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.