THE MONTEFIORE ENDOWMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance the property of the Charirty; Promoting the advanced study of Judaism; Training of scholars to be teachers, Ministers and Rabbis; Make grants to other institutions for further education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- Israel
Governance
- 20 August 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Jacqueline Basrawy JP | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Daniel Kessler | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
DANIEL RICHARD MURAD SOPHER | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||||
Charlotte Hannah Green | Trustee | 29 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||
ISAAC LEVY | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|||||||
ALAN BEKHOR | Trustee | 04 November 2013 |
|
|
||||||
RICK SOPHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
PAMELA SINYOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.30k | £105.10k | £86.10k | £93.13k | £166.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £531.55k | £527.02k | £640.06k | £589.27k | £573.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/04/2014
Charitable objects
1.THE MAINTENANCE AND SUPPORT OF THE SYNAGOGUE AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE MAUSOLEUM AND CEMETERY BELONGING TO THE CHARITY; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE MAINTENANCE AND PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE MOVEABLE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY INCLUDING SCROLLS OF THE LAW, BELLS, CLOAKS, SILVER PLATE, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS AND PICTURES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY THINK FIT INCLUDING: A. THE DIGITISATION, TRANSLATION AND PUBLICATION OF BOOKS AND MANUSCRIPTS. B. THE DISPLAY OF ARTEFACTS 3.THE PROMOTION OF THE ADVANCED STUDY OF THE HOLY LAW AS REVEALED ON SINAI AND EXPOUNDED BY THE REVERED SAGES OF THE MISHNA AND TALMUD IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS;- A.IN THE TRAINING AND MAINTENANCE DURING TRAINING OF ORTHODOX JEWISH TEACHERS, MINISTERS AND RABBIS BY AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OF SUCH VALUE AND TENABLE AT SUCH INSTITUTIONS OF FURTHER EDUCATION AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY SHALL THINK FIT; B. BY MAKING GRANTS TO ANY INSTITUTION OF FURTHER EDUCATION WHICH PROVIDES SUCH EDUCATION AND IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES; C.IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY THINK FIT. 4. THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG ADULTS AND LAY READERS IN THE ORTHODOX JEWISH COMMUNITY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY THINK FIT, INCLUDING: A. THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF THE HOLY LAW AS REVEALED ON SINAI AND EXPOUNDED BY THE REVERED SAGES OF THE MISHNA AND TALMUD AND ITS APPLICATION TO CONTEMPORARY LIFE; B. THE PROVISION OF LEADERSHIP TRAINING. 5. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A. PROMOTING MUTUAL RESPECT AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN THOSE OF DIFFERENT FAITHS AND BELIEFS; B. TEACHING THE BENEFIT OF TOLERANCE, MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING, SOCIAL HARMONY AND INTEGRATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY LAW AS EXPOUNDED BY THE REVERED SAGES OF THE MISHNA AND TALMUD AND AS DEMONSTRATED IN THE LIFE OF SIR MOSES MONTEFIORE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 20 August 2008 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Montefiore Endowment
Schaller House
44A Albert Road
London
NW4 2SJ
- Phone:
- 02036375530
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window