Financial history FRIENDS OF AMASANGO

Charity number: 1116268
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £59.34k £44.61k £44.46k £46.51k £41.02k
Total expenditure £46.46k £31.97k £34.60k £51.49k £51.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A