Financial history THE LANGLEY BAND

Charity number: 1114177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.46k £6.74k £14.56k £16.05k £17.23k
Total expenditure £6.69k £7.13k £14.10k £17.12k £15.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A