Financial history OPEN AWARDS

Charity number: 1113612
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.24m £2.85m £3.13m £2.44m £3.10m
Total expenditure £1.70m £1.81m £2.43m £2.63m £3.19m
Income from government contracts £1.02m £1.42m £1.41m £96.80k £567.85k
Income from government grants N/A £3.37k £13.51k £3.00k £9.72k
Income - Donations and legacies £16.12k £14.25k £13.51k £76.39k £9.72k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £324.55k
Income - Charitable activities £2.19m £2.79m £3.09m £2.28m £2.66m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £33.99k £23.78k £22.51k £85.97k £109.09k
Income - Other £0 £23.28k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.69m £1.78m £2.41m £2.63m £2.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.71k £14.60k £12.73k £266 £280.32k
Expenditure - Governance £8.19k £10.50k £43.30k £7.66k £14.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £20.00k £2.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £14.71k £14.60k £12.73k £266 £338
Expenditure - Other £0 £12.00k £0 £0 £0