THE TOM AP RHYS PRYCE MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ASSIST DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN/YOUNG PEOPLE ACHIEVE POTENTIAL BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES. HELP TACKLE AND PREVENT CAUSES OF VIOLENT GANG CULTURE AND CRIME THROUGH EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS. AIMS ARE MET BY FUNDING ORGANISATIONS/PROJECTS, IDENTIFYING SYNERGIES BETWEEN THEM, PROMOTING LINKS AND EXCHANGE OF IDEAS/EXPERIENCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 January 2006: Standard registration
- 26 October 2021: Funds received from 1063861 SUPPORTING CHILDREN OF WANDSWORTH TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNA LOUISE FIRTH | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER JAMES YOUNG | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patrick William Robinson | Trustee | 24 March 2015 |
|
|||||
JOHN HENRY AP RHYS PRYCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CALLUM JAMES FARQUHARSON MCGEOCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.62k | £59.15k | £64.87k | £45.05k | £96.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £132.72k | £113.02k | £121.50k | £108.93k | £152.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO STUDENTS TO ATTEND ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT; AND ALSO 2. FOR SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LINKLATERS
1 SILK STREET
LONDON
EC2Y 8HQ
- Phone:
- 02074562000
- Email:
- tomstrust@linklaters.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window