FRESH INSPIRATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fresh Inspiration is a charity that is focused on activities (including fundraising) that alleviate the root causes of poverty and deprivation around the world. Our aim is to be effective, relevant and responsive; working in the best interest of all our key stakeholders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 January 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Pinheiro | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Uzochikwa Nwuga | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Reynold Williams | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS FOLA KOMOLAFE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.93k | £29.14k | £76.69k | £54.03k | £41.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.81k | £21.80k | £41.42k | £69.96k | £58.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £15.43k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 October 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 October 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
3. OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE, UPHOLD AND ADVANCE THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN GENERAL AND IN PARTICULAR TO WORK WITH AND STRENGTHEN THE WORK OF CHRISTIANS AND CHURCHES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD IN RENDERING SERVICES TO THE COMMUNITIES 3.2 TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE VULNERABLE (INCLUDING CHILDREN / YOUNG PEOPLE, ELDERLY, WIDOWS & SINGLE PARENTS, VICTIMS OF ABUSE) AND IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIPS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD 3.3 TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND PARTICULARLY WHEN ARISING FROM ANY PUBLIC CALAMITY OR THE LACK OF NATURAL OR ARTIFICIAL RESOURCES OR THE MEANS TO DEVELOP THEM, WHETHER ACTING ALONE OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH OTHERS 3.4 TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN DIFFERENT PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
DIFFERENT PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fresh Inspiration
Margaret Powell House
423 Midsummer Boulevard
Milton Keynes
MK9 3BN
- Phone:
- 07880898640
- Email:
- Fola@freshinspiration.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window