HOME-START SOUTHERN OXFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start is a voluntary home-visiting scheme for families with pre-school children who may be under stress and experiencing difficulties. Volunteers offer regular support to the families in their own homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,227 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 April 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOREEN MARJORIE MCNULTY | Chair |
|
||||||
Janet Rimmer | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Christine Grandison | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ABIGAIL HELEN ELIZABETH REYNOLDS | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Couldrick | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
GILL BODEY | Trustee | 30 July 2013 |
|
|||||
HELEN CHRISTABEL CONWAY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.30k | £143.46k | £121.37k | £137.60k | £195.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £143.27k | £124.28k | £138.79k | £167.30k | £169.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.04k | £8.43k | £12.54k | £15.13k | £16.23k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF SOUTHERN OXFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
SOUTHERN OXFORDSHIRE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home-Start Southern Oxfordshire
197 Broadway
DIDCOT
OX11 8RU
- Phone:
- 01235511152
- Email:
- admin@homestartso.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window