THE ELIZABETH AND RICHARD WILSON CHARITABLE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to further religious and charitable work of Church of England and Methodist Church to help young people to develop their capacities to award scholarships, exhibitions, bursaries or maintenance allowances to any educational establishment to persons under the age of 18 years to further Scout /Guide Associations or other charitable youth organisation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lancashire
Governance
- 10 May 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ELIZABETH HODGSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr JOHN SHAKESPEARE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
SALLY MARGARET RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MICHAEL ROWLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/05/2020 | 10/05/2021 | 10/05/2022 | 10/05/2023 | 10/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.26k | £17.58k | £9.01k | £8.64k | £30.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.40k | £29.86k | £31.19k | £27.73k | £37.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 May 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 May 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2022 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 1 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 14 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
10% TO VICAR AND CHURCHWARDENS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF WARTON FOR THE UPKEEP OF THE GRAVEYARD; 10% TO THE SUPERINTENDENT MINISTER OF THE CIRCUIT IN THE METHODIST CONNECTION FOR THE WARTON METHODIST CHAPEL; 10% TO WARTON PARISH COUNCIL FOR ANNUAL EDUCATIONAL GRANTS; 70% OF THE INCOME OF THE FUND TO BE APPLIED FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION CONSIDER FIT: (I) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN LANCASTER MORECAMBE AND CARNFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS. (II) TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE METHODIST CHURCH IN LANCASTER MORECAMBE AND CARNFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS. (III) TO ENABLE PARISH CHURCHES IN LANCASTER MORECAMBE AND CARNFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS TO BE KEPT IN GOOD ORDER AND REPAIR. (IV) TO ENABLE METHODIST CHAPELS IN LANCASTER MORECAMBE AND CARNFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS TO BE KEPT IN GOOD ORDER AND REPAIR. (V) TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE RESIDENT IN LANCASTER MORECAMBE AND CARNFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. (VI) IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE TO ANY SCHOOL OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES TO PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 18 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN LANCASTER MORECAMBE AND CARNFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS. (VII) TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION OR ANY UNIT THEREOF, THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION OR ANY UNIT THEREOF OR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE YOUTH ORGANISATIONS IN LANCASTER MORECAMBE AND CARNFORTH AND THE SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS.
Area of benefit
LANCASTER AND MORECAMBE AND SURROUNDING RURAL AREAS INCLUDING WARTON NEAR CARNFORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Joseph A Jones & Co Llp
6 Fenton Street
LANCASTER
LA1 1TE
- Phone:
- 0152463371
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window