THE CHRISTIAN MUSLIM FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Forum for Christian Muslim relations. Opportunities for a broad range of Christians and Muslims to meet and understand each other, developing models of disagreeing well and enabling participants to interpret experiences back to their own communities. Activities include church-mosque twinning, discussion of controversial topics, public events and the production of useful resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 June 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Marjorie Dhell | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Rt Rev Martin Gorick | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Aliya Azam | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
Imam Qari Asim | Trustee | 17 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rt Rev Paul Joseph Hendricks | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
Shaykh Ibrahim Mogra | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.57k | £41.42k | £24.01k | £15.98k | £19.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.64k | £37.39k | £21.58k | £21.57k | £22.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 MAY 2005. as amended on 14 Oct 2019 as amended on 09 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO WORK FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR TO ASSIST THE CHRISTIAN AND MUSLIM FAITHS TO DEVELOP MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING THROUGH DIALOGUE, EVENTS AND PROJECTS IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
200A PENTONVILLE ROAD
LONDON
N1 9JP
- Phone:
- 02078325841
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window