REDROW FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty and sickness in the UK and to provide accommodation and related assistance including respite care especially for children, the elderly and those who are sick or infirm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 February 2006: Standard registration
- 06 June 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 06 June 2024: Funds transferred to 1003859 HOPE HOUSE CHILDREN'S HOSPICES
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £130 | £186 | £115 | £48 | £44 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £30.00k | £0 | £30.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO APPLY ITS INCOME TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION AND RELATED ASSISTANCE, INCLUDING RESPITE CARE, ESPECIALLY FOR CHILDREN, THE ELDERLY AND THOSE WHO ARE SICK OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window