VINE COUNSELLING SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vine Counselling Services provides affordable (donation based) professional counselling services through qualified and trainee counsellors and practitioners to adults and children/young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Somerset
Governance
- 02 February 2007: Standard registration
- VINE COUNSELLING (Working name)
- VINE COUNSELLING AND PASTORAL SERVICES (Previous name)
- VINE COUNSELLING SERVICES (NORTH SOMERSET) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH JANE SHEEHAN | Chair | 06 April 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Catherine Smillie | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Cordelia Pegge | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||
CAROL BEVERIDGE | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN WARD | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
BARBARA HACKING | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
IAN RUSSELL STOCKER | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
ANN PURSEY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.99k | £57.92k | £78.01k | £105.04k | £92.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.16k | £45.42k | £70.11k | £86.61k | £76.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.65k | £6.00k | £1.00k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUNE 2010. as amended on 07 Jun 2021 as amended on 22 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE PREDOMINANTLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE LOCAL NORTH SOMERSET AREA BY PROMOTING AND PROTECTING THEIR MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELLING, WORKING/LIAISING WITH OTHER LOCAL AGENCIES AS REQUIRED. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED PROFESSIONAL COUNSELLING TO ALL PERSONS WHO ARE DESIROUS OF RECEIVING THE SAME IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR RELIGIOUS DENOMINATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NORTH SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Refectory
Station Road
Congresbury
Bristol
BS49 5DX
- Phone:
- 01934876377
- Email:
- info@vinecounselling.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window