Financial history THE STREAM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1115232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £3.93k £4.36k £3.24k £4.14k £2.81k
Total expenditure £2.40k £3.08k £2.35k £3.99k £2.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A