WAGING PEACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Works to educate the public, UK politicians & the international community about systematic human rights abuses & genocide occurring in the present day, with a particular focus on Sudan. Also to assist Sudanese refugees in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Sudan
Governance
- 30 June 2008: Standard registration
- ARTICLE 1 CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mahgoub Tawer Kafi | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amna Abdallah | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaughnessy Hawkins | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Harding-Mbogo | Trustee | 02 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA CARMICHAEL TINSLEY | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dame Rosalind Marsden | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Richard Cockett | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Toufique Hosaain | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.32k | £88.19k | £128.39k | £132.10k | £158.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.14k | £87.47k | £83.97k | £103.36k | £144.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 June 2022 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 August 2020 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 27 JAN 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF WAR AND PEACE, THE ENVIRONMENT AND DEMOCRACY; AND THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS ("UDHR") AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS AND IN REGIONAL CODES OF HUMAN RIGHTS WHICH INCORPORATE THE RIGHTS CONTAINED IN THE UDHR AND THOSE SUBSEQUENT CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS), FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC FOR PEOPLE PRINCIPALLY SITUATED IN SUDAN, AND ANY OTHER PLACES IN THE WORLD THAT THE CHARITY TRUSTEES CONSIDER APPROPRIATE, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY: MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS BY: ORGANISING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CONFERENCES, COURSES OF INSTRUCTION, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES; PUBLISHING BOOKS, PAMPHLETS, REPORTS, LEAFLETS, JOURNALS, FILMS, TAPES AND INSTRUCTIONAL MATTER ON ANY MEDIA; AND SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES NECESSARY FOR PROMOTION OF THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY; PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND ASSISTING AND SUPPORTING ANY OTHER CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHICH THE CHARITY TRUSTEES CONSIDER TO BE WORKING TO PROMOTE OR ADVANCE OBJECTS EQUIVALENT TO THOSE OF THE CHARITY. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIES OUT ITS OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 ST MARY'S STREET
STAMFORD
PE9 2DF
- Phone:
- 02081919235
- Email:
- info@wagingpeace.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window