CHOBHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote the benefit of the inhabitants of the parish of Chobham by securing the establishment of a community centre and the maintenance and management of the same.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LEONARD EDWARD BENTALL FCA DL | Chair | 18 September 2019 |
|
|||||||
Annette Rosa Barber | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Jack Massarano | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Emma Kennedy | Trustee | 05 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Carol Ann Gregorious | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
cllr. Christopher Guy Rowbotham cllr. | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
David Burke | Trustee | 06 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
NICOLA WENDY BIDDLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.39k | £18.02k | £52.33k | £27.79k | £37.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.13k | £30.55k | £37.77k | £36.91k | £45.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £6.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CHOBHAM IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE BOROUGHS OF RUNNYMEDE SURREY HEATH AND WOKING (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS BY SECURING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE SAME.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF CHOBHAM IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD IN THE BOROUGHS OF RUNNYMEDE SURREY HEATH AND WOKING
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTWAYS FARM
GRACIOUS POND ROAD
CHOBHAM
SURREY
GU24 8HH
- Phone:
- 01276 857019
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window