YEOVIL COUNSELLING AND PREGNANCY CRISIS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust purposes are: a) the advancement of education in the subject of emotional and psychological health, including pregnancy and its termination and the effects thereof on any individual whether physical, medical or psychological; b) the preservation and protection of women's health; c) the provision of advice, counselling and assistance to any individual and their partners and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 07 March 2007: Standard registration
- 06 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 February 2024: Funds transferred to 279473 ST MARGARET'S SOMERSET HOSPICE
- 06 February 2024: Funds transferred to 299679 Sands
- 06 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1127379 THE ETHIOPIAN GRADUATE SCHOOL OF THEOLOGY TRUST
- 06 February 2024: Funds transferred to 1109626 MIND IN SOMERSET
- C4Y (Working name)
- YEOVIL PREGNANCY CRISIS CENTRE (Working name)
- YPCC (Working name)
- YEOVIL COUNSELING PREGNANCY CRISIS TRUST (Previous name)
- YEOVIL COUNSELLING PREGNANCY CRISIS TRUST (Previous name)
- YEOVIL PREGNANCY CRISIS TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.74k | £28.20k | £34.37k | £43.65k | £38.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.83k | £32.13k | £36.17k | £37.68k | £47.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | £10.93k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 03/02/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/11/2015
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE SUBJECT OF EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL HEALTH, INCLUDING PREGNANCY AND THE TERMINATION OF PREGNANCY AND INTO THE EFFECTS THEREOF UPON ANY INDIVIDUAL WHETHER PHYSICAL, MEDICAL OR PSYCHOLOGICAL; B) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF WOMEN'S HEALTH; C) THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND ASSISTANCE TO ANY INDIVIDUAL AND THEIR PARTNERS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY PHYSICAL OR MENTAL ILLNESS, DISTRESS OR POVERTY GENERALLY, INCLUDING DURING OR AS A RESULT OF PREGNANCY OR FOLLOWING AN ABORTION, MISCARRIAGE, COT DEATH, STILL BIRTH, LOSS OF A CHILD OR SEXUAL ABUSE; D) THE PROMOTION OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH MAY CONVENIENTLY BE CARRIED ON IN CONNECTION WITH THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
SOMERSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window