Financial history THE FRIENDS OF KENTISH TOWN SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1113905
Charity reporting is up to date (247 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £20.60k £10.00k £10.42k £7.03k £36.04k
Total expenditure £18.90k £211 £22.70k £10.19k £32.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A