ST LUKE'S HEALTHCARE FOR THE CLERGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Luke's supports the mental health and wellbeing of the Anglican clergy. It offers one-to-one care and treatment with trained health professionals. It also offers wellbeing services to clergy via their dioceses and training colleges, such as resilience training workshops, establishing reflective practice groups and other activities to help clergy to flourish in their ministry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 March 2008: Standard registration
- ST LUKE'S (Working name)
- St Luke's for Clergy Wellbeing (Working name)
- ST LUKES HOSPITAL (Working name)
- ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL FOR THE CLERGY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanna Bardsley | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Roger Dunn | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
The Rt Revd Timothy Martin Thornton | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
GRAEME POLLARD | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jean McDonald | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Venerable Richard Lee Simpson | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Hilary Margaret Ison | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEPHEN LISTER FIELDING | Trustee | 19 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr GARY THOMAS BELL | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.94k | £164.96k | £195.94k | £246.68k | £286.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £366.28k | £359.64k | £388.87k | £390.96k | £402.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 21 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 OCTOBER 2009 AND NAME AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION 10 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR TO PROVIDE ACCESS TO SUCH FACILITIES AS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BE APPROPRIATE TO MAINTAIN OR IMPROVE THE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH OF SUCH OF THE FOLLOWING NAMELY: AT THIS POINT REFER TO OBJECTS ON GOVERNING DOCUMENT
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 103
Church House
27 Great Smith Street
London
SW1P 3AZ
- Phone:
- 02045467000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window