MEETH PARISH HALL

Charity number: 1114440
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide venue to hold community events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 16 March 2024

Total income: £3,364
Total expenditure: £2,388

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 May 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Nadine Shaw Trustee 09 March 2023
None on record
Michael John Tunnicliffe Trustee 09 March 2023
None on record
Jane Elizabeth Louise Doyle Trustee 23 August 2022
None on record
Peter Francis Doyle Trustee 23 August 2022
None on record
NINA LOUISE COLLINGS Trustee 23 August 2022
None on record
DAWN REDDING-SMITH Trustee 17 September 2011
None on record
TREVOR CHAPMAN Trustee
None on record
JANET MAY CHAPMAN Trustee
HATHERLEIGH SPORTS FIELD
Received: On time
PETER JAMES COBBLEDICK Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/03/2020 16/03/2021 16/03/2022 16/03/2023 16/03/2024
Total gross income £1.17k £10.02k £445 £1.22k £3.36k
Total expenditure £739 £823 £2.08k £1.88k £2.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 16 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 16 March 2023 14 May 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 16 March 2022 28 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 16 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 16 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Old Rectory
Meeth
OKEHAMPTON
Devon
EX20 3EP
Phone:
01837810171
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available