FRIENDS OF GARGET WALKER HOUSE

Charity number: 1115714
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SUPPORTING PEOPLE AFFECTED BY DEMENTIA IN RICHMONDSHIRE PROVIDING RESOURCES AND ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA ATTENDING GARGET WALKER HOUSE DAY CENTRE AND SUPPORTING CARERS EVENTS AND ACTIVITIES IN RICHMONDSHIRE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £4,378
Total expenditure: £28,927

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 August 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDA SUSAN CURRAN DL Trustee 23 February 2024
PAUL CURRAN CELEBRATION TRUST
Received: On time
Paul Hodgson Trustee 23 February 2024
THE FRIENDS OF RICHMOND FRIARY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Lorraine Hilary Hodgson Trustee 23 February 2024
None on record
Stephen James Gibbens Trustee 23 February 2024
None on record
Melva Jean Steckles Trustee 22 February 2024
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.07k £3.69k £47.63k £4.10k £4.38k
Total expenditure £18.69k £5.23k £15.48k £13.18k £28.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.96k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
32 Bolton Avenue
RICHMOND
North Yorkshire
DL10 4BA
Phone:
07775337133
Website:

No information available