Financial history HAMPSHIRE FA FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity Number: 1116324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £42.56k £1.14k £5.61k £7.40k £7.40k
Total expenditure £43.80k £1.84k £12.16k £10.29k £10.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A