THE SOCIAL MOBILITY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Social Mobility Foundation is a charity that helps talented young people 16-25 from low-income backgrounds achieve their potential. Our programmes offer mentoring, university and job application support, skills and careers advice and work experience. We advocate and campaign for social mobility and undertake research including the annual Social Mobility Employers Index.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£2,528,870
Donations and legacies | £2.37m | |
Charitable activities | £138.68k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £16.85k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,408,650
Raising funds | £29.06k | |
Charitable activities | £3.38m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £14,000 from 15 government contract(s) and £242,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £29.06k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.38m |
People

62 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
2200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 22 August 2006: Standard registration
- THE LINKSON FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rt Hon Alan Milburn | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Tom Peter Rockhill | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Railton | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Elizabeth Owen | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lee Edward Cain | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Dawson | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Namrata Patel | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Bandhana Kumari Rawal | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Rodham | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Doherty | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.01m | £2.21m | £2.51m | £2.81m | £2.53m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.88m | £1.56m | £1.80m | £2.56m | £3.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £10.69k | £29.96k | £14.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.27k | £10.00k | £224.00k | £224.00k | £242.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.99m | £954.38k | £1.18m | £2.74m | £2.37m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £1.25m | £1.33m | £67.08k | £138.68k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £684 | £949 | £159 | £0 | £16.85k | |
|
Income - Other | £13.64k | £2.34k | £2.43k | £8.18k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.87m | £1.51m | £1.78m | £2.54m | £3.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £14.93k | £51.83k | £13.57k | £21.37k | £29.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £10.20k | £93.43k | £10.20k | £27.24k | £18.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.61k | £7.62k | £5.26k | £26.75k | £19.30k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £800.38k | £1.36m | £2.01m | £2.21m | £1.81m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £421.19k | £332.45k | £272.62k | £234.98k | £707.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 2006 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 16 JULY 2006 AND 8 NOVEMBER 2006 as amended on 30 Apr 2020 as amended on 07 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
The Charity’s objects (the “Objects”) are to advance the education of disadvantaged young people in the United Kingdom in particular, but not exclusively by: 3.1.1 affording opportunities to obtain internships and other work experience with organisations working in the professions and the fields of commerce, banking, financial services, industry and administration or such other fields as the Trustees in their absolute discretion see fit; and 3.1.2 advising and assisting young people to enter and progress in careers in the professions and the fields of commerce, banking, financial services, industry and administration or such other fields as the Trustees in their absolute discretion see fit.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON AND GREATER LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Social Mobility Foundation
The Timber Yard
17 Drysdale Street
London
N1 6ND
- Phone:
- 02071831189
- Email:
- info@socialmobility.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window