BETHEL HEALTH AND HEALING NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bethel network is a Christian organisation, which exists to promote the heallth and well-being of the people of Birmingham and its environs. We achieve this providing a range of support through counselling, parish nursing and in the future a Health & Healing Centre offering a variety of services. We are currently providing practical support to the people of Sparkhill and Sparkbrook.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 26 September 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Fanny Iklaki | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Carvalho | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Jeanette Burrows | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Duncan Roland Moore | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Graham Hindle | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.94k | £383.49k | £305.73k | £301.35k | £393.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.58k | £284.80k | £379.00k | £374.00k | £386.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AND MINUTES DATED 10 JULY 2006 AND WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 11 JAN 2008. as amended on 26 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A CHRISTIAN HEALTH AND HEALING SERVICE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, PRAYER AND HEALING, HEALTH ADVICE, SUPPORT AND HEALTHY LIVING ACTIVITIES. (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE AND TRAINING ON HEALTH AND HEALING AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Floor 1 Bloomsbury Health Centre
63 Rupert Street
BIRMINGHAM
B7 5DT
- Phone:
- 01216614276
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window