THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE BUDAPEST FESTIVAL ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Friends of the Budapest Festival Orchestra supports the orchestra's performances and the BBC Proms and other performances in the U.K.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Hungary
Governance
- 02 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Gemes | Chair | 01 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Donna Chen | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.99k | £9.00k | £8.05k | £15.60k | £16.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.28k | £8.81k | £6.49k | £19.26k | £17.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 20 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 14 June 2022 | 379 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 2 JUNE 2006
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY SUPPORTING THE ACTIVITIES OF THE BUDAPEST FESTIVAL ORCHESTRA (THE 'ORCHESTRA') OR ANY SUCCESSOR ORCHESTRA THERETO WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, HUNGARY OR ELSEWHERE INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL AND OTHER SUPPORT: 1 TO ENABLE THE ORCHESTRA TO PERFORM WORKS OF MUSIC; 2 TO ENABLE THE ORCHESTRA TO PERFORM WITH GUEST ARTISTS; 3 TO FACILITATE THE ACQUISITION, RENTAL OR OTHER USE OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, SCORES AND OTHER EQUIPMENT NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE FOR THE EFFECTIVE PERFORMANCE OF THE ORCHESTRA; 4 TO ENABLE THE ORCHESTRA TO CARRY OUT ITS ASSISTANT CONDUCTOR PROGRAMME; 5 TO PROMOTE THE ORCHESTRA'S CHILDREN'S CONCERT PROGRAMMES; 6 TO ENABLE THE ORCHESTRA (AND ITS INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OR ANY OF THEM) TO UNDERTAKE TOURS AND PERFORM ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Garden Flat
19 Thurlow Road
LONDON
NW3 5PL
- Phone:
- 07900163290
- Email:
- algemes@aol.com
- Website:
-
bfobfo.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window