DAI UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mainly, to enhance the effectiveness and integrity of Christian leaders worldwide by providing leadership development courses, management consulting and mentoring relationships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- China
- Colombia
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- Ethiopia
- Finland
- Gabon
- Ghana
- Grenada
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Honduras
- India
- Indonesia
- Ivory Coast
- Japan
- Kenya
- Laos
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Mexico
- Mongolia
- Nepal
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Peru
- Philippines
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Senegal
- South Africa
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- Togo
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United States
- Vietnam
- Zambia
Governance
- 10 August 2006: Standard registration
- DAI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lyn Nicholls | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Shiva Narayan Shrestha | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jean Stevenson | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Matthew Prior | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SYDNEY ROGERS | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian Derbyshire | Trustee | 29 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.32k | £40.15k | £61.10k | £51.37k | £51.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.20k | £45.90k | £61.31k | £48.64k | £48.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN LEADERS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 GORDON ROAD
WINDSOR
SL4 3RG
- Phone:
- 01753439010
- Email:
- dai-uk@daintl.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window