LEEDS BAROQUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LEEDS BAROQUE PERFORMS MUSIC OF THE BAROQUE ERA USING PERIOD INSTRUMENTS AND HISTORICAL PERFORMING PRACTICES. IT SEEKS TO BALANCE ITS PROGRAMMING BETWEEN WELL KNOWN WORKS (ESPECIALLY THE WORKS OF PURCELL, HANDEL AND BACH) AND THOSE THAT ARE RARELY PERFORMED, OR NEWLY EDITED BY LEADING SCHOLARS OR BY RESEARCH STUDENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
- City Of York
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 01 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Bryan Douglas White | Chair |
|
||||||
Dr Christopher Roberts | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN LESLEY JOHNSON MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
NICOLA RACHEL SAPIRO | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.39k | £6.56k | £5.30k | £13.96k | £18.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.02k | £3.85k | £4.55k | £12.15k | £15.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 November 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED 7 OCTOBER 2006 as amended on 22 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSIC, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) MUSIC OF THE BAROQUE PERIOD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. LEEDS, YORK, AND HALIFAX
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 GROSVENOR PARK
LEEDS
LS7 3QD
- Phone:
- 01133438228
- Email:
- jlj@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window