Accounts and annual returns CORNWALL YOUTH BRASS BAND

Charity Number: 1116586
Charity reporting is overdue by 1508 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 47 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 412 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 778 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 778 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1143 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1143 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1508 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1508 days