GREATER MORPETH DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Greater Morpeth Development Trust will develop Morpeth to be a premier market town in North East England, promoting and improving the town and countryside for public benefit, economic and social well-being of people living and working in Morpeth and surrounding areas of Northumberland through the promotion of urban and rural regeneration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,573 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 28 November 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tamsin Susan Louise Sharp | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Robson MBE | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Foskett | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|||||
David Charles Richards | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Burrow | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
FRANK RESCIGNO | Trustee | 09 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Mike Willis | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.63m | £68.07k | £41.49k | £46.36k | £76.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.76k | £219.89k | £207.63k | £212.77k | £197.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £544.00k | £4.40k | £5.98k | N/A | £6.57k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.60m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £27.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £139.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £16.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 February 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/08/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE TOWN OF MORPETH AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF NORTHUMBERLAND) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP: B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT: C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE: D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES: E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS: F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING: G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES: H) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE: I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES: J) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT: K) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE: L) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME
Area of benefit
MORPETH, NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Benjamin Green House
Coopies Lane
MORPETH
Northumberland
NE61 2SL
- Phone:
- 01670503866
- Email:
- info@gmdt.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window