Financial history CIBSE BENEVOLENT FUND TRUST

Charity number: 1115871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £58.19k £51.41k £50.72k £64.90k £72.51k
Total expenditure £43.41k £47.96k £63.10k £57.27k £61.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A