Financial history THE CORPUS CHRISTI NICHOLAS BACON FUND

Charity number: 1115923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £28.27k £20.25k £23.36k £28.52k £29.91k
Total expenditure £19.58k £9.07k £17.68k £23.64k £24.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A