THE CORPUS CHRISTI NICHOLAS BACON FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support for undergraduate or postgraduate members of Corpus Christi College who are studying or researching law or those who intend to study or research law at the College.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 25 August 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM JAMES LAWRENCE | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|||||
LORD MARK THOMAS BARON BRIDGES KCVO | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|||||
Professor Jonathan Edward Morgan | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Dr MARINA FRASCA SPADA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.27k | £20.25k | £23.36k | £28.52k | £29.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.58k | £9.07k | £17.68k | £23.64k | £24.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 JULY 2006 AS VARIED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT DATED 8 MARCH 2008.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR (A) UNDERGRADUATE OR POSTGRADUATE MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE WHO ARE STUDYING OR RESEARCHING LAW OR (B) THOSE WHO INTEND TO STUDY OR RESEARCH LAW AT THE COLLEGE (WHETHER THEY ARE PROSPECTIVE OR EXISTING MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE) AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE (WHETHER FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE) (2) OTHERWISE TO FURTHER THE STUDY AND EDUCATION OF THOSE PERSONS MENTIONED IN SUBCLAUSE (1) HEREIN (3) SUBJECT TO PRIORITY BEING GIVEN TO THE OBJECTS SET FORTH IN SUBCLAUSES (1) AND (2) HEREIN, AND IN THE EVENT THAT FUNDS ARE NOT REQUIRED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE PURPOSES SET FORTH IN THE PRECEDING SUBCLAUSES (1) AND (2) HEREIN, TO BE AVAILABLE FOR THE BENEFIT OF UNDERGRADUATE OR POSTGRADUATE MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE (OR PROSPECTIVE MEMBERS OF THE COLLEGE) IN ANY OTHER DISCIPLINE WHICH IS THE SUBJECT OF STUDY OR RESEARCH AT THE COLLEGE IN THE LIKE TERMS AS SET OUT IN THE PRECEDING SUBCLAUSES (1) AND (2) HEREIN (4) SUBJECT TO PRIORITY BEING GIVEN TO THE OBJECTS SET FORTH IN SUBCLAUSES (1), (2) AND (3) HEREIN, AND IN THE EVENT THAT FUNDS ARE NOT REQUIRED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE PURPOSES SET FORTH IN THE PRECEDING SUBCLAUSES (1), (2) AND (3) HEREIN, OTHERWISE TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE DEVELOP OR IMPROVE THE TEACHING AND STUDY OF LAW OR RESEARCH INTO THE LAW AT THE COLLEGE (5) SUBJECT TO PRIORITY BEING GIVEN TO THE OBJECTS SET FORTH IN SUBCLAUSES (1), (2), (3) AND (4) HEREIN, AND IN THE EVENT THAT FUNDS ARE NOT REQUIRED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR THE PURPOSES SET FORTH IN THE PRECEDING SUBCLAUSES (1), (2), (3) AND (4) HEREIN, OTHERWISE TO PROMOTE ENCOURAGE DEVELOP OR IMPROVE THE TEACHING AND STUDY OF OR RESEARCH INTO ANY OTHER DISCIPLINE WHICH IS THE SUBJECT OF STUDY OR RESEARCH AT THE COLLEGE IN SUCH MANNER AND BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT NOTHING IN THIS PRESENT CLAUSE OR IN ANY OTHER PROVISION IN THIS DEED SHALL AUTHORISE OR PERMIT THE PAYMENT OR APPLICATION OF ANY CAPITAL OR INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AND NO PART OF SUCH CAPITAL OR INCOME SHALL AT ANY TIME OR IN ANY CIRCUMSTANCES BE PAID OR APPLIED FOR ANY PURPOSE OR IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CAMBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CORPUS CHRISTI COLLEGE
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1RH
- Phone:
- 01223338000
- Email:
- treasurer@corpus.cam.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window