Financial history PROTON FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1121153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £51.73k £66.22k £120.81k £164.01k £183.26k
Total expenditure £73.69k £70.86k £126.64k £164.39k £151.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £890 £1.00k