RICHARDSON BROTHERS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established to promote and assist charitable activity that improves the circumstances of those less fortunate in our society, through groups concentrating on "disadvantage and self help", emphasising education, social projects and disabled service personnel i.e. community development, civic corporate leadership, skills and leadership for young people, retired and disabled ex service personnel.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 August 2006: Standard registration
- THE T J RICHARDSON FAMILY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Howard Belton | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|||||
RACHEL FIONA BROWN | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Narinder Paul | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
LEE SCOTT RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTYN FORD RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £240.19k | £270.47k | £251.19k | £256.44k | £268.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £100.52k | £110.27k | £132.97k | £154.41k | £133.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 AUGUST 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AT LAW
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Richardsons
4 Birchley Estate
Birchfield Lane
OLDBURY
B69 1DT
- Phone:
- 0203 817 8983
- Email:
- info@richardsons.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window