LEATHERHEAD CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The study and practice of choral music, and fostering public knowledge and appreciation of such music by means of public performance. To support and participate in the Leith Hill Musical Festival.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 31 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Fletcher Foulsham | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
LINDSAY JEAN THORNE | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sarah Hunt | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Judith Le Grice | Trustee | 10 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.04k | £4.53k | £16.07k | £24.74k | £22.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.47k | £4.43k | £13.45k | £25.19k | £19.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 03 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 June 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
A. THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC, AND TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE; B. TO ASSIST AND SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LEATHERHEAD AND ITS ENVIRONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 Hilley Field Lane
Fetcham
LEATHERHEAD
Surrey
KT22 9UU
- Phone:
- 07850 230516
- Email:
- info@leatherhead-choral.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window