Trustees BRANSTON AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1116041

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Haresign | Chair | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Anne Skilbeck | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Susan Sargent | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Judith Barnard Crowe | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Coral Elaine Earney | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Taylor | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Antony Dawes | Trustee | 16 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Katie Baldwin | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE BARR | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Josef Niklas Waltz | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Pickersgill | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Smok | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Foster | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.