ARK ON THE EDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a rescue for domestic animals & wildlife. We have done more direct rehoming due to covid restrictions. Groups of all ages are welcome and the centre caters for the disabled. We provide animal and environment education for all age groups with customised training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 31 October 2006: Standard registration
- 11 November 2016: Funds received from 1098383 ARISTOCAT RESCUE
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Perkins | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paula Sproat | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Simon Clennell | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH ANNETTE THOMPSON | Trustee | 19 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CARTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.13k | £6.65k | £9.89k | £3.43k | £4.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.69k | £33.13k | £9.78k | £16.20k | £21.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
IN SO FAR AS IT IS PRACTICAL SO TO DO, TO ENHANCE THE WELFARE AND RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ALL ANIMALS (INCLUDING BIRDS AND MAMMALS) BROUGHT TO THE CENTRE, WHETHER WILD OR DOMESTICATED. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE CARE AND RECEPTION OF SUCH ANIMALS UNTIL THEIR RELEASE BACK INTO THE WILD OR THEY CAN BE RELOCATED IN GOOD HOMES. WHERE REHOUSING OR RETURN TO THE WILD IS IMPRACTICAL, TO CARE FOR THE ANIMAL FOR THE REMAINDER OF ITS NATURAL LIFE, OR UNDER VETERINARY ADVICE ONLY, TO PERMIT THE ANIMAL IN QUESTION TO BE PUT DOWN. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF ANIMALS, HABITATS AND WILD FLORA AND FAUNA THROUGH EDUCATIONAL VISITS, OPEN DAYS, NATURE TRAILS, SEASONAL DISPLAYS, INTERPRETATION BOARDS AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
COUNTY DURHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ashtree Cottage
The Edge
Woodland
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL13 5RF
- Phone:
- 01388 718977
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window