THE ANCHOR SOCIETY LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals, makes grants to organisations, provides buildings/facilities/open spaces
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 16 October 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian James Hanson | Trustee | 16 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Hannah Lucy Wallington | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|||||
MR ERIC EVANS | Trustee | 14 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.22k | £83.27k | £82.58k | £94.05k | £113.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.71k | £13.95k | £24.81k | £46.67k | £17.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS IN NEED RESIDENT IN BRISTOL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (WHICH SHALL MEAN ALL AREAS WHICH AT THE DATE OF THIS MEMORANDUM HAVE A POSTCODE WITH A "BS", "BA" OR "GL" PREFIX) IN SUCH WAYS (BEING CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE CHARITY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
BRISTOL, NORTH SOMERSET AND GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
BENNETTS
BARLEY WOOD STABLES
LONG LANE
WRINGTON
BRISTOL
BS40 5SA
- Phone:
- 01934862786
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window