ALIVE BELIEVERS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide Spiritual, Health and Well-being Support for Children, Youth, and Older People; Promoting Community Cohesion through Luncheon Club, Education, Employment Services, Music, Basic Computing & Counselling and Providing Support Services for people with Mental health problems, and Older People, raising awareness of Dementia, isolation and independent living
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,660 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 04 July 2007: Standard registration
- 05 December 2019: Funds received from 1099560 AFRICAN ELDERS ASSOCIATION
- ALIVE BELIEVERS CHURCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ABEL KEHINDE ADEGOKE | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr OLAPOSI SIMEON KEHINDE MBSFFARCSI | Trustee |
|
||||||||
Dr BABATUNDE ENIOLA OGUNBIYI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr VICTOR EBENUWA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.50k | £138.85k | £116.92k | £138.68k | £114.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.78k | £112.86k | £108.11k | £102.60k | £110.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.51k | N/A | £32.08k | £9.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 AUGUST 2005, AS AMENDED 6 OCT 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ENGLAND AND WALES (WITH THE BASE IN LIVERPOOL) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, WORSHIP SERVICES, BIBLE STUDY, TRACTS PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION . 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN LEARNING CO-CORPORATE SINGING OF HYMNS, THE USE OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS, SUCH AS KEYBOARD, GUITAR, FLUTE, TRUMPET, DRUMS ETC, AND BASIC COMPUTING PROGRAMMES FOR BEGINNERS. 3. TO PROVIDE CONCILIATION SERVICE, THROUGH PROFESSIONALLY TRAINED COUNSELLORS, TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, FOR COUPLES WHOSE RELATIONSHIP APPEARS TO BE BREAKING DOWN, AND WHERE BREAKDOWN ALREADY OCCURS, TO ADVISE AND HELP IN THE SETTLEMENT OF DIFFERENCES OR POTENTIAL DIFFERENCES OVER ASSOCIATED MATTERS, SUCH AS CUSTODY, ACCESS TO CHILDREN ETC. 4. TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF MERSEYSIDE, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, AGE SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
MERSEYSIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alive Believers Church
259-261 Boaler Street
LIVERPOOL
L6 9DH
- Phone:
- 01512619161
- Email:
- alive.believers@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window