Financial history ANNA'S HOPE

Charity Number: 1116512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £79.67k £30.25k £28.13k £52.39k £52.53k
Total expenditure £182.08k £156.40k £147.63k £95.15k £2.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A