Financial history SHANNON TRUST

Charity Number: 1117249
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £813.45k £789.72k £1.11m £2.47m £3.58m
Total expenditure £657.61k £755.71k £1.12m £2.25m £3.53m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £75.86k £1.29m £2.19m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £767.88k £734.69k £854.70k £937.64k £1.25m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £26.69k £54.38k £251.40k £1.52m £2.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.70k £555 £4.24k £13.71k £20.79k
Income - Other £17.18k £96 £137 £71 £108
Income - Legacies £98.18k £0 £40.25k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £607.04k £682.65k £1.01m £2.14m £3.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £50.57k £73.06k £104.52k £105.86k £139.60k
Expenditure - Governance £17.11k £11.90k £9.56k £9.69k £11.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0