Financial history EMPOWER - THE EMERGING MARKETS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1118916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.92m £5.38m £5.38m £5.37m £2.66m
Total expenditure £4.25m £3.89m £6.59m £5.80m £3.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.73m £5.38m £3.42m £3.80m £1.95m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £2.19m £0 £1.96m £1.56m £673.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £751 £0 £199 £9.02k £34.81k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £5.38m £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.92m £3.80m £6.43m £5.55m £2.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £327.26k £87.30k £168.38k £248.68k £181.10k
Expenditure - Governance £1.80m £0 £1.17m £1.22m £633.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.11m £2.17m £5.25m £3.13m £1.68m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0