Financial history NOTTINGHAM CONTEMPORARY

Charity number: 1116670
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.58m £1.99m £2.28m £2.25m £2.23m
Total expenditure £2.54m £1.82m £2.16m £2.30m £2.16m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.21m £1.61m £1.34m £1.11m £1.02m
Income - Donations and legacies £82.10k £33.97k £30.38k £28.94k £295.66k
Income - Other trading activities £679.51k £76.32k £275.76k £425.43k £374.72k
Income - Charitable activities £1.71m £1.58m £1.74m £1.57m £1.33m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.12k £16.71k £20.51k £28.53k £26.09k
Income - Other £93.47k £278.94k £211.48k £204.42k £205.88k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.11m £1.58m £1.88m £2.03m £1.91m
Expenditure - Raising funds £438.86k £238.40k £282.34k £275.11k £249.07k
Expenditure - Governance £21.30k £20.94k £22.28k £45.53k £18.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0